RI H7305 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY -- RHODE ISLAND FAIR HOUSING PRACTICES ACT - Prohibits discrimination based on housing status, define "assistance animal", make it unlawful to issue discriminatory notices or statements relating to the sale, rental or leasing of housing and to delete an unconstitutional provision.
Title
Prohibits discrimination based on housing status, define "assistance animal", make it unlawful to issue discriminatory notices or statements relating to the sale, rental or leasing of housing and to delete an unconstitutional provision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7305.pdf |