RI H7299 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- ACCIDENT AND SICKNESS INSURANCE POLICIES - Requires health insurance policies to provide coverage for the licensed practice of naturopathy and to provide reports.
Title
Requires health insurance policies to provide coverage for the licensed practice of naturopathy and to provide reports.
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Tina Spears [D] | Rep. Jose Batista [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2024) |
2024-02-12 | House | Meeting postponed (02/13/2024) |
2024-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7299.pdf |