RI H7287 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Referred to Senate Labor
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Referred to Senate Labor
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals ยง 28-12-9 of the general laws which provides that the director of labor and training may approve of wages below the minimum wage for those persons whose earning capacity is impaired due to physical or mental disability.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Jose Serodio [D] |
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Labor |
2020-02-25 | House | House read and passed |
2020-02-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/25/2020) |
2020-02-11 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/11/2020) |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2020) |
2020-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |