RI H7279 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Bars adjusters and contractors from premises under investigation by the fire marshal until premises are released, and provides penalties for violation.
Title
Division Of Fire Safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-09 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-07-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-05-26 | House | House voted to recommit to House Corporations |
2016-05-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/26/2016) |
2016-05-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2016) |
2016-02-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/03/2016) |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |