RI H7270 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that estates in Rhode Island be taxed at a rate equal to the maximum credit for state death taxes allowed by the federal revenue act, which exemption is set at five million three hundred forty thousand dollars ($5,340,000).
Title
Estate And Transfer Taxes
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2016) |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7270.pdf |