RI H7267 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education -- Maintenance Of Order On Campus (require Campus Police Officers Who Have Successfully Completed The Ri Municipal Police Training Academy Or Its Equivalent, And A Firearms Training Program As Required Under Section 11-47-15.1, To Carry A Firearm)
Title
An Act Relating To Education -- Maintenance Of Order On Campus (require Campus Police Officers Who Have Successfully Completed The Ri Municipal Police Training Academy Or Its Equivalent, And A Firearms Training Program As Required Under Section 11-47-15.1, To Carry A Firearm)
Sponsors
Rep. John Carnevale [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Doreen Costa [R] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2012) | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7267.pdf |