RI H7246 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the sunset provision which ends historic preservation tax credits by June 30, 2020 or upon the exhaustion of the maximum aggregate credits, whichever comes first.
Title
Relating To Taxation-historic Preservation Tax Credits 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
Rep. June Speakman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-06-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2020) |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7246.pdf |