RI H7242 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate the six (6) month limit for adult education work readiness from the requirements for cash assistance
Title
The Rhode Island Works Program
Sponsors
Rep. Maria Cimini [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Frank Ferri [D] |
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-21 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-21 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-19 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2014) |
2014-04-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2014) |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |