RI H7217 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants residential purchasers of solar energy systems protections and disclosures in the retail sale/lease documents.
Title
Residential Solar Energy-- Disclosure And Homeowners Bill Of Rights Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. James Jackson [D] |
Rep. John Lyle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2020) |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7217.pdf |