RI H7195 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts 43 Railroad Street, Woonsocket, Plat 14R, Lot 205 from the provisions of ยง 3-7-19 regarding the permitting of alcoholic beverages retail licenses within a certain proximity to schools and churches.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Licenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2020-02-07HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2020)
2020-01-22HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback