RI H7184 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MILITARY AFFAIRS AND DEFENSE -- VETERANS' AFFAIRS-MILITARY SPOUSE LIAISON - Establishes the position of military spouse liaison, in the office of veteran's services, to conduct outreach and advocate on behalf of military spouses in the state.
Title
Establishes the position of military spouse liaison, in the office of veteran's services, to conduct outreach and advocate on behalf of military spouses in the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2024) |
2024-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Military Affairs And Defense
MILITARY AFFAIRS AND DEFENSE -- VETERANS' AFFAIRS-MILITARY SPOUSE LIAISON
MILITARY AFFAIRS AND DEFENSE -- VETERANS' AFFAIRS-MILITARY SPOUSE LIAISON
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7184.pdf |