RI H7184 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits/establishes criminal penalties for the importing/selling/offering for sale/purchasing/bartering/possessing with intent to sell elephant ivory/rhinoceros horn with limited exceptions.
Title
Sale Of Ivory Or Rhinoceros Horns
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2018) |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7184.pdf |