RI H7179 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Expressing Opposition To President Donald J. Trump's Decision To Allow Offshore Drilling In Most Of America's Coastal Waters
Title
House Resolution Expressing Opposition To President Donald J. Trump's Decision To Allow Offshore Drilling In Most Of America's Coastal Waters
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2018) |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/28/2018) |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7179.pdf |