RI H7159 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a classified employee, whose position is not fully funded through federal loans and/or grants to seek the nomination of or to be a candidate for elective state office.
Title
Merit System
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2018) |
2018-03-06 | House | Meeting postponed (03/07/2018) |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7159.pdf |