RI H7118 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/26/2018)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/26/2018)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that municipal pension funds only be diverted to the state upon approval of the applicable decision-making body after a public hearing, and a minimum of thirty (30) days prior written notice to affected employees.
Title
Pathway To Retirement Security Act For Locally Administered Pension Funds
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/26/2018) |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7118.pdf |