RI H7100 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- LILA MANFIELD SAPINSLEY COMPASSIONATE CARE ACT - Establishes the process to provide a legal mechanism whereby a terminally ill patient may choose to end their life using medications prescribed by a physician.
Title
Establishes the process to provide a legal mechanism whereby a terminally ill patient may choose to end their life using medications prescribed by a physician.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2024) |
2024-02-12 | House | Meeting postponed (02/13/2024) |
2024-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7100.pdf |