RI H7098 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Honorable Mary A. Orfanello to join Marge M. Urquhart and Matthew P. Orfanello in marriage on or about April 2, 2022, within the City of Pawtucket, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Jacquelyn Baginski [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Steven Lima [D] |
Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary: Passage in concurrence (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Committee on Special Legislation: Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Committee on Special Legislation: Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-03-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/08/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2022) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2022-02-03 | House | House read and passed |
2022-01-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/03/2022) |
2022-01-26 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/26/2022) |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |