RI H7091 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the penalties and fines for the various motor vehicle offenses involving leaving the scene of an accident.
Title
Accidents And Accident Reports
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Jan Malik [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/26/2016) |
2016-01-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7091.pdf |