RI H7087 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits an insurer or health care entity from requiring pre-authorization and/or co-payments for certain medical testing prescribed by a physician where the physician determines there is an immediate threat to that person's health.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Karen Macbeth [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Joseph Trillo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/19/2016) |
2016-01-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7087.pdf |