RI H7076 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the Honorable Stephen R. Ucci to join Darlene M. Boudreau and the Honorable Michael A. Morin in marriage on or about July 30, 2020, within the City of Warwick, Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-06 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06HouseHouse read and passed
2020-02-06HousePlaced on House Calendar (02/06/2020)
2020-02-06HouseRemoved from House Consent Calendar and
2020-01-30HouseCommittee recommends passage
2020-01-24HouseScheduled for consideration (01/30/2020)
2020-01-10HouseIntroduced, referred to House Special Legislation

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback