RI H7064 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-03 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/07/2018)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-03 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/07/2018)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ends the voting of mail ballots at local board of canvassers. It also authorizes in-person early voting effective July 1, 2018, with the actual procedures to be established by rules promulgated by the state board of elections.
Title
Mail Ballots--in-person Early Voting
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/07/2018) |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7064.pdf |