RI H7063 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND HOUSING AND RESOURCES ACT OF 1998 - Incorporates universal design principals into new construction of low- and moderate-income housing to provide greater accessibility for persons with disabilities.
Title
Incorporates universal design principals into new construction of low- and moderate-income housing to provide greater accessibility for persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/25/2024) |
2024-01-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Subjects
State Affairs And Government
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND HOUSING AND RESOURCES ACT OF 1998
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND HOUSING AND RESOURCES ACT OF 1998
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7063.pdf |