RI H7057 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs school superintendents to review and respond to discipline data where there is an unequal impact on students based on race, ethnicity, or disability. No out of school suspensions unless student's conduct meets certain standards.
Title
School Committees And Superintendents
Sponsors
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/20/2016) |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7057.pdf |