RI H7053 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (jacqueline C. Damato To Join Theresa R. Fraatz And Michael A. Disano In Marriage)
Title
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (jacqueline C. Damato To Join Theresa R. Fraatz And Michael A. Disano In Marriage)
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Roberto DaSilva [D] | Rep. Peter Kilmartin [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-02-11 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2010-02-04 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2010-02-04 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2010-01-13 | House read and passed | |
2010-01-07 | Placed on House Calendar |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7053.pdf |