RI H7035 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that any person convicted of larceny of a package delivered by any government or private delivery service, shall, if committing larceny while operating a motor vehicle, that motor vehicle shall be subject to forfeiture.
Title
Theft, Embezzlement, False Pretenses, And Misappropriation
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Christopher Millea [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/28/2020) |
2020-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7035.pdf |