RI H7023 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a classified employee, whose position is not fully funded through federal loans and/or grants to seek the nomination of or to be a candidate for elective state office.
Title
Merit System
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
Rep. Mario Mendez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2020) |
2020-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7023.pdf |