RI H7013 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the exemption from taxation of property belonging to Brown University professors.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation - Brown University Professors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/27/2016) |
2016-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7013.pdf |