RI H6662 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Same as 21H-5327 -- Increases the maximum aggregate amount of community remote net-metering systems from 30 MW to 60 MW and requires the allocation of a minimum of 35% of the generated power to low- or moderate-income households commencing July 1, 2021.
Title
Net Metering
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2022-06-22 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |