RI H6408 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Central Falls to issue bonds in an amount not to exceed $5,760,000 to finance the construction, renovation, improvement, alteration, repair, furnishing and equipping of schools and school facilities in the city.
Title
Relating To School Construction And Financing In The City Of Central Falls And Authorizing The City Of Central Falls To Issue Not To Exceed $5,760,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Furnishing And Equipping Of Schools And School Facilities In The City
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-29 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-28 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-06-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |