RI H6402 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a judge emeritus license plate for the retired family court judge, Stephen J. Capineri.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2021-06-22 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2021) |
2021-06-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |