RI H6352 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Dignity at Work Act, to provide workers with more protection from bullying and harassment in the workplace.
Title
Dignity At Work Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/09/2021) |
2021-05-20 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6352.pdf |