RI H6346 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that when a person causes an injury requiring medical assistance to a human by firearm, archery, or crossbow while hunting, the initial responding entity must immediately make a report to DEM.
Title
Hunting And Hunting Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/26/2021) |
2021-05-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6346.pdf |