RI H6337 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the transacting parties/new hospital seeking conversion to supply additional information in application for review by the DOH/DAG relating to staffing levels/pension plans/community impact.
Title
The Hospital Conversions Act
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/20/2021) |
2021-05-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6337.pdf |