RI H6336 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that if the Rhode Island housing and mortgage finance corporation is a tax title purchaser, it shall not be liable for violations in connection with the tax title property, prior to the expiration of five (5) years from the date of the tax sale.
Title
Tax Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Tax sales (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |