RI H6310 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the department of health to obtain an annual estimate of the number of children born to Rhode Island families who face significant risk factors known to impair child development.
Title
Home-visiting System Components
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |