RI H6288 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Validates and ratifies amendments to the Home Rule Charter of the town of West Warwick, which amendments were adopted and approved by the electors of the town of West Warwick on May 19, 2016.
Title
Ratification Of Charter Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-26 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2017) |
2017-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |