RI H6286 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the word “war” from the sentence “honorable discharged war veteran.”
Title
Rhode Island Veterans' Home
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/08/2021) |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2021) |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2021-05-25 | House | House read and passed |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2021) |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2021) |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/13/2021) |
2021-04-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |