RI H6267 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for an interest and penalty free period for the payment of sales and income taxes due to the state for the calendar year 2021 and continuing through March of 2021 for income taxes and August 2021 for sales taxes.
Title
Relating To Taxation
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Rep. Bernard Hawkins [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/20/2021) |
2021-04-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6267.pdf |