RI H6266 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-17 - Scheduled for hearing (10/03/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-17 - Scheduled for hearing (10/03/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enable the state lottery division of the department of revenue to enter into a contract extension with IGT Global Solutions Corporation.
Title
Enabling The State Lottery Division Of The Department Of Revenue To Contract With Igt Global Solutions Corporation
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing (10/03/2019) |
2019-09-24 | House | Committee heard and continued |
2019-09-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing (09/24/2019) |
2019-06-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6266.pdf |