RI H6217 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island hope scholarship act to provide up to the cost of two (2) years of tuition costs and mandatory fees for eligible students in hopes to increase the numbers for enrollment and graduation.
Title
Rhode Island Hope Scholarship Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Brianna Henries [D] | Rep. Nathan Biah [D] |
Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/20/2021) |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6217.pdf |