RI H6217 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts the property located at 375 Smith Street, Providence, from the provisions prohibiting liquor licenses within a proximity of two hundred feet (200') of a school or church.
Title
Proximity To Schools And Churches
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |