RI H6188 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that if an insurance company is unable to obtain a certificate of title for a vehicle, the insurance company or its agent may apply for and obtain, free and clear of all liens and claims of ownership, a salvage certificate of title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Salvage Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-20HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2021-07-12HouseTransmitted to Governor
2021-07-01SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2021-07-01SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2021)
2021-06-25HouseHouse passed Sub A
2021-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/25/2021)
2021-06-23HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2021-06-20HouseProposed Substitute
2021-06-20HouseScheduled for consideration (06/23/2021)
2021-06-20HouseMeeting postponed (06/22/2021)
2021-06-19HouseProposed Substitute
2021-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration
2021-04-05HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-04-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2021)
2021-03-31HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback