RI H6167 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Westerly to issue bonds and notes not to exceed 71 million for school improvements.
Title
Authorizing The Town Of Westerly To Issue Not To Exceed $71,000,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Furnishing And Equipping Of Schools And School Facilities Throughout The Town, Subject To Approval Of State Housing Aid At A Reimbursement Rate Or State Share Ratio Of Not Less Than 35% For Expenditures Eligible For State Aid And Provided That The Authorization Shall Be Reduced By Any Grant Received From The School Building Authority Capital Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-31 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2019-05-31 | House | Meeting postponed (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-05-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6167.pdf |