RI H6156 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Country Club, Inc.
Title
An Act To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Country Club, Inc.
Sponsors
Rep. Jan Malik [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-12 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-06-11 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2013) |
2013-06-11 | House | House read and passed |
2013-06-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2013) |
2013-06-04 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-05-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2013) |
2013-05-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6156.pdf |