RI H6142 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds a requirement to obtain a hoisting engineering license that a person possess a certificate of registration as a registered apprentice engineer.
Title
Hoisting Engineers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor |
2017-04-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2017) |
2017-04-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6142.pdf |