RI H6135 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Reinstating The Life Of And Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Known As The "rhode Island Online Data Transparency And Privacy Protection Commission" (reinstates The Life And Extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The "rhode Island Online Data Transparency And Privacy Protection Commission" From February 5, 2019, To February 5, 2020, And Would Expire On May 5, 2020.)
Title
House Resolution Reinstating The Life Of And Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Known As The "rhode Island Online Data Transparency And Privacy Protection Commission" (reinstates The Life And Extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The "rhode Island Online Data Transparency And Privacy Protection Commission" From February 5, 2019, To February 5, 2020, And Would Expire On May 5, 2020.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-05-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6135.pdf |