RI H6121 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a core state behavioral health crisis services system to be administered by the director of behavioral healthcare, developmental disabilities and hospitals.
Title
Core State Behavioral Health Crisis Services Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2023) |
2023-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H6121.pdf |