RI H6117 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides employers who permit employees to report to work shall pay the employee for not less than 3 hrs wages. An exception would be provided for agreed work shifts scheduled for less than 3 hrs and for college student employees working for the college.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-21 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/22/2019) |
2019-05-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |