RI H6078 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Names the URI College of Engineering Building as the "Fascitelli Center for Advanced Engineering."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permanent Joint Committee On Naming All New Buildings, Bridges, Edifices And Other State Constructions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18HouseHouse read and passed
2019-06-14HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/18/2019)
2019-06-13HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-06-07HouseScheduled for consideration (06/13/2019)
2019-05-16HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2019)
2019-05-08HouseIntroduced, referred to House Special Legislation

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback