RI H6074 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the housing jobs department and a series of other initiatives designed to create jobs in housing construction, specifically affordable and low-income housing, green and solar energy jobs and programs for low-income individuals.
Title
Housing Construction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2021) |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6074.pdf |